Date | Chamber | Action |
1/8/2013 | House | Session Sine Die |
5 ILCS 315/15 | from Ch. 48, par. 1615 |
40 ILCS 5/1-161 new |
40 ILCS 5/1-162 new |
40 ILCS 5/1-163 new |
40 ILCS 5/2-124 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-124 |
40 ILCS 5/2-126 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 2-126 |
40 ILCS 5/14-131 |
40 ILCS 5/14-133 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-133 |
40 ILCS 5/15-155 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-155 |
40 ILCS 5/15-157 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 15-157 |
40 ILCS 5/16-152 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-152 |
40 ILCS 5/16-158 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 16-158 |
40 ILCS 5/18-131 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-131 |
40 ILCS 5/18-133 | from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 18-133 |
Date | Chamber | Action | 1/13/2011 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross | 1/13/2011 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | 1/13/2011 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | 1/13/2011 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | 1/18/2011 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo | 1/18/2011 | House | First Reading | 1/18/2011 | House | Referred to Rules Committee | 2/8/2011 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | 2/9/2011 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris | 2/9/2011 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | 2/17/2011 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | 3/17/2011 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | 5/25/2011 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | 1/8/2013 | House | Session Sine Die |